Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pennington, Bryan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Winters , William Henry, against School Board Of Hillsborough County, Florida, represented by Murman , James Alan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Hinson, C.. Carl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHinson, C.. Carl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL PTC 3/24/20 @ 9AM - JURY TRIAL 4/6-17/20 @ 830AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.