Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cook, Raynee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tribble , Tarya Arnshelic, against Scalici, Christopher, represented by Lao , Joseph Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Holder, P. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolder, P. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S- PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK DUE TO DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND MOTION TO DISMISS FILED ON 2/11/19 |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT S - PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED CHRISTOPHER SCALICI, 2/4/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.