Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Branch Banking And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ross, Leslie H, Unknown Spouse Of Leslie H Ross, Ross, Carolyn, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stoddard, C.. Ralph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoddard, C.. Ralph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -3- $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTE MORTGAGE ALLONGE | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORIGINAL NOTE MORTGAGE ALLONGE DISPOSAL | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE LA GACETA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.