Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Direct General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Savage , Robert Kevin, against Estep, Ronnie Allen, Everett, Iyana T, Memorial Hospital Of Tampa, Stowers, Nancy Yates, Transcare Medical Transportation, (total of 5) See All represented by Lewis , Andrew James, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FINAL) AGAINST NANCY YATES STOWERS AND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF TAMPA |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FINAL) AGAINST IYANA TASHAY EVERETT |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.