Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Arseneau, Kathryn, Arseneau, Jean Alphonse, Unknown Tenant 1, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Peacock, A. Emily presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeacock, A. Emily Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED KATHRYN ARSENEAU, AS COTRUSTEE OF THE ARSENEAU REVOCABLE TRUST NO 1 DATED JULY 24, 2017 |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 1/7/19 |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER PLT |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X3 - eservice@tromberglawgroup |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE) | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.