Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Colliflower, Deborah, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mathias , John Robert, against Legend Oaks Llc, Robbins Property Associates, Llc, represented by Azzarone , Jason Michael, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRice, G. Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryPremises Liability-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS, MATERIALS, AND INFORMATION |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FOR CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS, MATERIALS, AND INFORMATION |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.