Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gte Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindhardt , Christopher Charles, against Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 3, Unknown Party 4, Walden, Theresa E, (total of 5) See All represented by Carey , Richard Brian, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -1- $50,000 Or Less |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORIGINAL NOTE MORTGAGE ALLONGE DISPOSAL | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT JUDGMENT AMOUNT $29,770.00; INTEREST DUE $348.31; REGISTRY FEES $459.27; RECORDING/PREP FEES $20.00; TTL $30,597.58 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED PROPERTY REDEEMED |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF REDEMPTION PROCEEDS |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF We have accepted the Certificate of Title, Certificate of Sale or Certificate of Disbursement through the E-Portal. These certificates and the Proposed Uniform Final Judgment of Foreclosure must be de |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE We have accepted the Certificate of Title, Certificate of Sale or Certificate of Disbursement through the E-Portal. These certificates and the Proposed Uniform Final Judgment of Foreclosure must be de |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE We have accepted the Certificate of Title, Certificate of Sale or Certificate of Disbursement through the E-Portal. These certificates and the Proposed Uniform Final Judgment of Foreclosure must be de |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.