Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hix, Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Kessler, Michael Ray, Kessler, Jonathan Michael, Geico General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Peacock, A. Emily presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeacock, A. Emily Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION SETTING CAUSE FOR TRIAL |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JONATHAN KESSLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.