Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Sanchez, Alexis, Martinez, Darion Pila, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ALEXIS SANCHEZ, 2/21/19 |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DARION PILA MARTINEZ, 1/3/19 |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X2 - subrogation@gray-robinson |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.