Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hillsborough County, filed a(n) Other case against The Estate Of Rose F Giddens, The Unknown Beneficiaries Of The Estate Of Rose F Giddens, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens | |
May 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK DUE TO ANSWER FILED ON 4/3/19 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | REPORT OF GUARDIAN- ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM JAY PASSER , ESQ., IS HEREBY APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM 03/28/19 RAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.