Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hillsborough County, filed a(n) Other case represented by Weidner , Matthew Decell, against White, Shellie, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED PER ORDER DTD 6/5/19 MJC conklinles@yahoo |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION - GRANTED |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $17,417.40 CLERK FEE $280.50 DOC STAMP FEE $ 127.40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.