Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Locust Hll Country Club, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Peters, Kostas, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRice, G. Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryEnforce Order/Judgment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER RETURNED SERVED KOSTAS PETERS 10/03/2019 |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 10/30/19 @ 1:10PM |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED KOSTAS PETERS, 4/30/19 |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | REGISTERED MAIL TO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.