Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lombard, Catherine Marie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Lombard, Daniel Edward, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF WILL APPEAR IN PERSON |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED DANIEL EDWARD LOMBARD, 12/4/18 |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT DEF - CONTRAVENING GARNISHMENT |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT DEFENDANT DANIEL EDWARD LOMBARD S VERIFIED - TO REGIONS BANK AND REOUEST FOR A HEARING |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; ALBERTO F. GOMEZ, JR., ESQ. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.