Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, Gloria, filed a(n) Other case against Overseas Shipholding Group, Inc., Osg Ship Management Inc, Overseas New York Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL PRE TRIAL ON 11/26/19 AT 10:30 AM -- NON JURY TRIAL DURING THE WEEK OF 12/09/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.