Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davidian, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Trimming , Tami Ann, against Progressive American Insurance Company, The Travelers Home And Marine Insurance Company, Toledo, Juan Deonez, represented by Accardi , Wendy Brause, Hennes , Christine Raub, Kelley, Robert P, Montoto , Christy Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stoddard, C.. Ralph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoddard, C.. Ralph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME DEFENDANT'S- TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR SECOND |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.