Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dent, Bryan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hutchinson , Ryan Mark, against Diehm, Wanda, Maguire, Morgan, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Robles, Maria, represented by Williams , Cecelia Anita, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, K. Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING DATE: 01/29/2020 HEARING TIME: 2:00 PM |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION BRYAN DENT |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLT - SERVED BY DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES COLLISION AVOIDANCE - TO PLAINTIFF, BRYAN DENT |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.