Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
George Salermo As Third-Party Beneficiary, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against American Security Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER GRANTING | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND STAY PROCEEDINGS |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - JOSEPH H. PICONE |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - PLEADINGS@STREMSLAW |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM STREMS LAW FIRM |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.