Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Helen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Niedens, Chase, Suncoast Pest Control Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT NO ATTACHMENTS- COS 10/3/18 |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516- MARLO A BODACH |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES-WITH NOTARIZED ATTACHMENTS |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTEROGATORIES |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - tim@bernsteininjurylaw |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.