Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Khawar, Haseeb, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Toth, Steven Jay, Zurich American Insurance Co, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey, L. Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED 10X, COS 12/5/18 - SUBPS ATTACHED |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION DEFENDANT - AND COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 - 12X, COS 10/19/18 |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FIRST |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE CO, CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER, REGISTERED AGENT 08/8/18 |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ISSUANCE OF SUBP AS DUCES TECUM AND REQUEST FOR COPIES |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED 12X, SUBPS ATTACHED, COS 10/2/18 |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEFENDANT S - PLAINTIFF S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.