Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guggino, Antonio, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Bain, David, Registered Nurse, St. Joseph'S Hospital, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT FULL AND COMPLETE SETTLEMENT |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL PRETRIAL 3/30/20 @ 2:30PM - JURY TRIAL 4/13/20 @ 9AM |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO - FOR RESCHEDULING TRIAL DATE |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.