Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Garcia, Michelle Y, Unknown Spouse Of Michelle Y Garcia, Carroll Oaks Homeowners Association Inc, Unknown Person S In Possession Of The Subject Property, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, K. Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED PURSUANT TO MEDIATED SETTLEMENT- BEFORE HEARING |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHELLE Y. GARCIA 8716 CARROLL PALM PL TAMPA FL 33614 |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY KAHANE & ASSOCIATES, P.A. 8201 PETERS RD SUITE 3000 PLANTATION FL 33324 |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHELLE Y. GARCIA, NON-SERVED |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHELLE Y. GARCIA |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY NKA JACKLYNN SALAZAR PIATO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.