Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cruz, Cynthia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Constable , James Scott, against Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Perez , Ronald Edwin, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey, L. Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM DISMISSAL DOCKET | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5/5/20 @ 11:00 AM |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT WAITING FOR ORDER |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 james@constable-law.com ; kate@constable-law.com ; lit@constable-law |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.