Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against West Meadows Property Owners Association Inc, Mcpherson, Kristy, Unknown Tenants Owners 1, Unknown Tenants Owners 2, Unknown Tenants Owners 3, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Manning, M. Daryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManning, M. Daryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, NON-SERVICE |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE) | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED WEST MEADOWS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., 8/3/18 |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 3 foreclosureservice@kasslaw.com; eportal@kasslaw |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.