Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Palano, Robert, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Haymore, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, Martha. J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, Martha. J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;2215;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/6374297E-1De1-4C3F-Aba0-1Ed9624Bfaf8/Results/6D57B313-Ab4E-40D9-891A-9Acffe3F7D9E/Lines/48Ca9C99-E7Db-496A-8E16-D7F1272B7255/Disposition_Html |
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: September 18, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 28, 2018REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: July 28, 2018ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 08, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 02, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2018E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 18, 2018ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 28, 2018LETTER FROM CLERK
Date: September 20, 2018FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2019REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: July 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DEFENDANT S- TO PLAINTIFF S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DEFENDANT S- TO PLAINTIFF S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.