Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cadet, Allan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Unice , Thomas Robert, Jr, against Hilton, Jason Freyre, Janer, Lester Allen, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Barnett , Karen Anne, Maxson , Kyle William, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEF - PLTF'S FIRST |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEF - INITIAL |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEFENDANT - FIRST - TO PLAINTIFF |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S- WITH INTERROGATORIES |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PLT - DEF STATE FARM FIRST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.