Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leal Gonzalez, Yoel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevens, P. William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
January 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 3/31/16 @ 11AM CR 502 Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - rob@rlnpa Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA
Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.