Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Curran, Ian, Unknown Spouse Of Ian Curran, Unknown Tenant No 1, Whispering Oaks Of Tampa Condominum Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 31, 2014E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST AND PAYMENTS Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Barbas, Rex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.