Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Solson, Aviva, Solson, Ronen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Schrader, Jaime E, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL DUE TO ABSENCE FROM JURISDICTION |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY CHRISTOPHER D. CODLING, ESQ., 12/22/16 - 1/9/17 |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION RONEN SOLSON, ON 01/19/17 AT 10:00 AM |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF AVIVA SOLSON, ON 01/19/17 AT 12;00 PM |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFFS' FACT AND EXPERT WITNESS LIST |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST (PLAINTIFFS') |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.