Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Spouse Of Karen Walker, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, Walker, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKiser, D. Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE CORRECTED |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.