Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nguyen, Phuong, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Weitzenfeld, Hal S, Weitzenfeld, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey, L. Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING on November 3, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., Motion to compel mediation or, in the alternative, waive mediation requirement |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 11/03/2016 2 PM |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE WAIVE REQUIREMENT OF MEDIATION |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT OT SUPPLEMENT RESPONSE TO 1ST EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PLAINTIFF |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT S ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S EXPERT DISCOVERY |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.