Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Varcardipone, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME --GRANTED 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING FROM DEFENDANT 11/30/15 EB |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BARBARA M BROWN ESQ |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ROBERT VARCARDIPONE 11/12/2015 |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) ALIAS / ROBERT VARCARDIPONE |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 Legalpleadings@pollackrosen.com; gomezj@pollackrosen |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ROBERT VARCARDIPONE |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON ROBERT VARCARDIPONE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.