Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Washington, Casandra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Zingaro, Ingrid, Zingaro Lugo, Alan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 7/9/15 @9AM - PLTFS MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION - 6/15/15 |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION - 6/11/15 |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 7/9/15 - ROOM 508 |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MOT FOR CASE MGMT | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM RETURNED SERVED GEICO RECORD CUSTODIAN, 4/28/15 |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.