Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
I Touch Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against B&Dfb Realty Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 11TH DAY OF MARCH, 2016 AT 9:00AM; |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NOTIFICATION BCS 01/08/15 |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED POSTED ON DOOR (EVICTION) |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED FARAJ HUSSAN/POSTED ON DOOR EVICTION |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1 |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION AND/OR PAST DUE RENT |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.