Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hill, Celeste N., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Dao, Hong Tuyet, John, Doe, Modern Nails By Dai Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey, L. Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/01/16 AT 2:00 PM |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RICHARD FISHER ON 08/18/16 @ 9 AM & JOANNE M. BUDASH ON 08/18/16 @ 10 AM |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RICHARD FISHER ON 08/18/16 @ 9 AM & JOANNE M. BUDASH ON 08/18/16 @ 10 AM |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED X1 SUB ATTACHED, COS 4/25/16 |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED 1X, COS 2/18/16 |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 04/2015 9 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.