Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Owners Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil case against Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Intec Building Services, Inc., Montoya Leon, Diana Carolina, Rlj Iii-Em Tampa Dt, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS INC |
|
November 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/18/2016 9 AM |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/1/16 @ 10:30AM - ROOM 514 |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TAX COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.