Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ashley Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc., Cheung, Ping, Teng Family Land Trust, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIPT OF |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD) PASCO COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRANSFER PASCO COUNTY |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS TRANSFERRED TO PASCO COUNTY |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING ON MAY 28, 2014 - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CHANGE OF VENUE | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MAY 28, 2014 AT 9:00 AM |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA AL SCAPIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.