Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Perkins, Billy, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO Ck# 84604 |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR GRANTING WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR FAILURE TO PAY RENT OR VACATE PREMISES- MOTION GRANTED- RCPJR 11/05/14 |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (UNIFORM VERIFIED) IN FORECLOSURE CASE |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.