Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Armenia, Maria, Ruel, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cao, Minh Hiev, Quinones, Huong Mai, United Services Automobile Association, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT RESULTED IN A SETTLEMENT BETWEEN , PLAINTIFF AND USAA |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT AND BOECHER INTERROGAOTRIES TO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION JAMES BETTS, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.