Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Yaylaian, David Charles, Yaylaian, Edward Nichan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Scott. Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISM'L W/ PREJUDICE |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT **FIRST** AGAINST DEFENDANTS / NO COS |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVID CHARLES YAYLAIAN 1/27/14 |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.