Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Terry, William James, Sabal Pointe Townhomes Property Owners Association, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED POSTED 4/21/15 - WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL ORDER ON TENANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION - WRIT ISSUED 4/17/15 |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER STAYING WRIT OF POSSESSION UNTIL 5/1/15 (EXPIRATION OF LEASE) CKV |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO Ck# 529203 |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION- CLERK SHALL ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION PUTTING PLTF IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES- JRPJR 04/17/15 |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FRANCIS E FRISCIA, ESQ. |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.