Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Green Tree Acceptance Inc, United States Of America, Unknown Heirs... In The Estate Of John H Lloyd, Deceased, Any And All Unknown Parties, Lloyd, Christopher, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BID |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE TAMPA BAY TIMES |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE ST PETERSBURG TIMES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.