Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Lauren, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Vasquez, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Scott. Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION LAUREN MARSHALL ON JULY 31, 2014 AT 2:00 PM |
|
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 10/06/2014 9 AM |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER REFERRAL TO MEDIATION |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.