Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Jose A, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Hsbc Bank, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF TO SUMMONS SERVED / NOTICE OF REMOVAL ATTACHED |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1 |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK reguarding the issuance of your summons |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.