Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smyler Asbury, Jodi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Travelers Home And Marine Insurance Company, Winton, Elisha Dakobe, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey, L. Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 3/2/16 AT 9:00 AM |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/22/14 AT 9:30AM |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JODI SMYLER ASBURY 06-26-2014 @10AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.