Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Genevie, Dennis M, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barton, M. James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarton, M. James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MONICA GEREKE RE: VOL DISMISSAL. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1487 - MTN SUMM JGMNT W/ATCHD AFFDVTS. USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DENNIS GENEVIE. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GENEVIE, DENNIS M. 01/07/10. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 31-DEC-2009,$410.00, User Id = MILLSL, Receipt No = 1729699. USER ID=MILLSL Judge: Barton, M. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.