Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Civil case against Durso, Gerald A, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArnold, D. James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT CLOSING CASE IN FAVOR OF PLTF AGAINST DEFT, GERALD A DURSO, III 05/12/11 JDA. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON-PAYMENT.. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE JEFFREY J. MOUCH, ESQ.. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND TO WITHHOLDING JUDGMENT. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR APPROVING STIPULATION 03/16/10 JDA. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.