Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Miklosovic, Stephen J, Par Enterprises Llc, Summerfield Riverwalk Village Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC file returned to rc Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL James Baxter - Redact Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.