Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Companymaria Mignosa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Clerk Of Court, Hillsborough County, Floridapo Box 1110, Diaz, Desirae Danielle, Diaz, Miguel Antonio, Iii, Plantation Homeowners Inc, State Of Florida, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2007-5 Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-5 against Miguel Antonio Diaz III, Unknown Spouse of...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION DOS 06-01-2010. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.