Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gary, Alfonso J, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F06822 03/13/2012 _______ Y0000571 _____1250.00 Credit 09-CA-032731 F06822 03/14/2012 _______ Y0000573 ____19750.00 Credit 09-CA-032731 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal is in transit to the Record Center Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $19,750.00 DOC STAMPS $147.00 REG FEE $322.50 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH DEP $1,250.00 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE PM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.