Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citifinancial Equity Services Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Vaughn, Gary L, Vaughn, Michele Y, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevens, P. William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE CYNTHIA RODRIGUEZ...MTN FOR SUMMRY FINAL JUDGMNT AND SUPPRTG AFFS. USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1487 - MTN SUMM JGMNT W/ATCHD AFFDVTS. USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOA TO GARY L VAUGHN AND MICHELE Y VAUGHN AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST OOB 8/9/10. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION COPY SENT TO NEWSPAPER GULF COAST BUSINESS REVIEW: ON OR BEFORE DATE: AUGUST 9, 2010. USER ID=BROWNSA Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ACESON A. CHAN, PARALEGAL. USER ID=BROWNSA Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.